US HB1964 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends federal recognition to the Lumbee Tribe of North Carolina and makes its members eligible for the services and benefits provided to members of federally recognized tribes. Members of the tribe residing in Robeson, Cumberland, Hoke, and Scotland counties in North Carolina are deemed to be within the delivery area for such services. The Department of the Interior and the Department of Health and Human Services must develop, in consultation with the tribe, a determination of needs to provide the services for which members of the tribe are eligible. Interior may take land into trust for the benefit of the tribe. Finally, North Carolina must exercise jurisdiction over all criminal offenses committed, and all civil actions that arise, on North Carolina lands owned by, or held in trust for, the Lumbee Tribe or any dependent Indian community of the tribe unless jurisdiction is transferred to the United States pursuant to an agreement between the tribe and the state.
Title
Lumbee Tribe of North Carolina Recognition Act
Sponsors
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Dan Bishop [R-NC] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2020-11-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5735-5736) |
2020-11-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1964. |
2020-11-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5735-5738) |
2020-11-16 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged. |
2019-12-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1368 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.