US HB1972 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-84. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-84. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1100 West Kent Avenue in Missoula, Montana, as the "Jeannette Rankin Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 1100 West Kent Avenue in Missoula, Montana, as the "Jeannette Rankin Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-84. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-04 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6767) |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 299. |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-10-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8176) |
2019-10-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1972. |
2019-10-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8176) |
2019-10-16 | House | Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-07-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB953 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Montana
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Montana
Postal service