US HB1979 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses certain driftnet fishing. (Driftnet fishing is a method of fishing in which a gillnet composed of a panel or panels of webbing, or a series of such gillnets, is placed in the water and allowed to drift with the currents and winds for the purpose of entangling fish in the webbing.) Currently, the use of large-scale drift gillnets with a total length of 2.5 kilometers or more is prohibited in the United States. The bill expands the definition of large-scale driftnet fishing to prohibit the use of gillnets with a mesh size of 14 inches or greater. This expanded prohibition does not apply within the U.S. exclusive economic zone for five years. The Department of Commerce must conduct a transition program to facilitate the phase out of large-scale driftnet fishing and to promote the adoption of alternative fishing practices that minimize the incidental catch of living marine resources. Commerce must award grants to program participants.
Title
Driftnet Modernization and Bycatch Reduction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB906 (Same As) 2021-01-01 - Vetoed by President.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1979/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1979/BILLS-116hr1979ih.pdf |