US HB1985 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount that employees may exclude from their gross income for employer-provided dependent care assistance. The bill increases the existing $5,000 limit by requiring annual adjustments that account for inflation.
Title
Family Savings for Kids and Seniors Act
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB749 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2230 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3903 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3300 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
SB2230 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3903 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3300 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 307.
Subjects
Child care and development
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax exclusion
Inflation and prices
Taxation
Disability and paralysis
Employee benefits and pensions
Income tax exclusion
Inflation and prices
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1985/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1985/BILLS-116hr1985ih.pdf |