US HB1986 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 104.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 104.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the criminal prohibition on the shipment, transport, possession, or receipt of a biological agent or toxin by a restricted person. Specifically, it updates references to the lists of agents and toxins covered by the prohibition.
Title
Effective Prosecution of Possession of Biological Toxins and Agents Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 104. |
2019-07-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-141. |
2019-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB744 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-31. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Chemical and biological weapons
Crime and law enforcement
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Terrorism
Crime and law enforcement
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Terrorism