US HB1988 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-10 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-10 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises loan seasoning requirements related to a refinanced Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) housing loan. Under current law, the VA is prohibited from guaranteeing a refinanced home loan until the date that is the later of (1) the date on which the sixth monthly payment is made, or (2) the date that is 210 days after the first payment is made. modifies this date to (1) when the borrower has made six consecutive monthly payments, or (2) 210 days after the first payment is due.
Title
Protecting Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 143. |
2019-07-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5274) |
2019-07-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1988. |
2019-07-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5274-5276) |
2019-07-09 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-138, Part I. |
2019-05-01 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1749 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-33. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Housing finance and home ownership
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs