US HB1990 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2026 assistance from the National Park Service for the National Aviation Heritage Area in Ohio.
Title
National Aviation Heritage Area Reauthorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB927 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2940 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2952 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2940 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2952 (Related) 2019-11-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Historic sites and heritage areas
Ohio
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Historic sites and heritage areas
Ohio
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1990/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1990/BILLS-116hr1990ih.pdf |