US HB1992 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the aggregate amount of a partner's annual tax deductions for qualified conservation contributions of a partnership to 2.5 times the partner's adjusted basis in the partnership. (Under current law, a "qualified conservation contribution" is the contribution of a qualified real property interest to a qualified organization exclusively for conservation purposes.) The limitation applies for the first three taxable years after the individual becomes a partner in the partnership. It does not apply to certain family partnerships.
Title
Charitable Conservation Easement Program Integrity Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB170 (Same As) 2019-01-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4751 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8842 (Related) 2020-12-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB4751 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8842 (Related) 2020-12-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Income tax deductions
Land use and conservation
Taxation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Income tax deductions
Land use and conservation
Taxation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1992/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1992/BILLS-116hr1992ih.pdf |