US HB200 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Border Wall Trust Fund Act This bill authorizes the Department of the Treasury to accept gifts of money for constructing, designing, or maintaining a barrier on the U.S.-Mexico border. Treasury shall establish the Border Wall Trust Fund to store the funds and a public website to receive such gifts. Such funds shall be appropriated for the border barrier and may not be used for any other purpose. The Department of Homeland Security shall provide for a commemorative display recognizing individuals who contributed to the Trust Fund. The display shall be part of the border barrier.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Border Wall Trust Fund Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB32 (Related) 2019-01-15 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H594)
HB256 (Related) 2019-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback