US HB2000 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes and funds the Medicare Exchange health plan, which allows individuals who are not otherwise eligible for Medicare to enroll in a government-administered health insurance plan. The Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) must offer such plan in certain individual health insurance exchanges beginning plan year 2021 and offer it in all individual health insurance exchanges beginning plan year 2024. CMS must offer the plan in the small group market in all geographic areas for plan year 2025. The plan must meet the same requirements, including essential health benefits, as existing health insurance exchange plans. Unless they opt out, health care providers enrolled under Medicare or under a state Medicaid plan must participate in the plan and are reimbursed at Medicare rates. The bill establishes a grants program for community organizations, educational institutions, and health agencies to create service partnerships and establish interactive data systems for health care providers. Additionally, the bill expands the premium tax credit available for plans purchased through an exchange and eliminates the restriction on the Department of Health and Human Services negotiating prescription drug prices for Medicare.
Title
Medicare-X Choice Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2947) |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1868 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB981 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB981 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Income tax credits
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Poverty and welfare assistance
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Higher education
Income tax credits
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Medicare
Poverty and welfare assistance
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2000/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2000/BILLS-116hr2000ih.pdf |