US HB2002 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to review its guidance governing U.S.-Taiwan relations and to reissue such guidance to the relevant executive branch departments and agencies. It also directs the State Department to report to Congress on the results of the review and on the implementation of the Taiwan Travel Act, which states that it is U.S. policy to allow and encourage engagement between U.S. and Taiwanese officials. The bill states that Taiwan is an important part of U.S. strategy in the region and urges the United States to conduct regular transfers of defense articles to enhance Taiwan's self-defense capabilities.
Title
Taiwan Assurance Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. George Holding [R-NC] |
Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-05-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3455-3456) |
2019-05-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2002. |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3455-3457) |
2019-05-07 | House | Mr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-04-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB878 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Taiwan
United Nations
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military operations and strategy
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Taiwan
United Nations