US HB2007 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to establish a program for the automated disclosure of taxpayer information for third-party income verification, and for other purposes. This bill requires the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to implement a program to ensure that certain disclosures of tax returns or return information for third-party income verification are (1) fully automated and accomplished through the Internet, and (2) accomplished in as close to real-time as is practicable. The requirement applies to IRS disclosures of returns or return information to a person verifying the income or creditworthiness of a taxpayer who is a borrower in the process of a loan application. In implementing the program, the IRS must (1) ensure that the program complies with applicable security standards and guidelines; and (2) assess and collect a fee for the disclosures at rates that are sufficient to cover the costs related to implementing the program, including the costs of necessary infrastructure or technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to establish a program for the automated disclosure of taxpayer information for third-party income verification, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1957 (Related) 2019-04-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 75.
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)
SB1100 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback