US HB2030 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-13)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 116-14. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-13)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Became Public Law No: 116-14. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of the Interior to carry out the Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan which was submitted to Congress on March 19, 2019, by Arizona, California, Colorado, Nevada, New Mexico, Utah, and Wyoming. Interior must execute the plan without delay and operate applicable Colorado River System reservoirs accordingly.
Title
Colorado River Drought Contingency Plan Authorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. John Curtis [R-UT] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] |
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] |
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-14. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-04-10 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2298) |
2019-04-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3112) |
2019-04-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2030. |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3112-3115) |
2019-04-08 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1057 (Related) 2019-04-09 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Arizona
California
Colorado
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Nevada
New Mexico
Utah
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wyoming
California
Colorado
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Nevada
New Mexico
Utah
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wyoming