US HB2033 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Releases to the State of Arkansas a reversionary interest in and to the surface estate of the land constituting Camp Joseph T. Robinson, consisting of approximately 141.52 acres.
Title
To release to the State of Arkansas a reversionary interest in Camp Joseph T. Robinson.
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB986 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Arkansas
Armed forces and national security
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
Armed forces and national security
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Military facilities and property
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2033/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2033/BILLS-116hr2033ih.pdf |