US HB2035 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the Lifespan Respite Care Program, which supports state lifespan respite care services (i.e., services for family caregivers of children and adults with special needs). The bill requires each state agency that is awarded a grant under the program to report any data required by the Department of Health and Human Services for program monitoring and evaluation.
Title
Lifespan Respite Care Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7308) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2035. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7308-7310) |
2019-07-24 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 135. |
2019-07-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-175. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-07-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB995 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Child health
Disability assistance
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Performance measurement
Disability assistance
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Performance measurement