US HB2036 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To prohibit any reduction in the amount of the per diem allowance to which members of the Army, Navy, Air Force, and Marine Corps or civilian employees of the Department of Defense are entitled based on the duration of temporary duty assignments or official travel, and for other purposes. This bill prohibits uniformed service agencies or the Department of Defense (DOD) from altering the amount of the locality-based travel and transportation per diem allowances or reimbursements to which certain uniformed service members or civilian DOD employees are entitled based on the duration of temporary duty assignments or official travel in a locality. The bill nullifies the DOD policy implemented on November 1, 2014, regarding reductions in per diem allowances based on the duration of temporary duty assignments or civilian travel. The National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2017 is amended to repeal the modifications to the flat rate per diem requirements for DOD military and civilian personnel on long-term temporary duty assignments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prohibit any reduction in the amount of the per diem allowance to which members of the Army, Navy, Air Force, and Marine Corps or civilian employees of the Department of Defense are entitled based on the duration of temporary duty assignments or official travel, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2017-04-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-04-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-04-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-04-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB901 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2987 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback