US HB2037 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Saudi Arabia Human Rights and Accountability Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Saudi Arabia Human Rights and Accountability Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 477 (Y: 405 N: 7 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2019-07-15HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-15HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 7 (Roll no. 477). (text: CR H5796-5797)
2019-07-15HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5814)
2019-07-15HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-07-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2037.
2019-07-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5796-5800)
2019-07-15HouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules.
2019-06-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-02HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback