US HB2041 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 and revises the Weatherization Assistance Program (WAP), including by requiring the Department of Energy to award financial assistance to certain private or nonprofit entities for WAP enhancement and innovation, such as installing renewable energy systems. WAP reduces energy costs for low-income households by increasing their energy efficiency.
Title
Weatherization Enhancement and Local Energy Efficiency Investment and Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB983 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 185.
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7516 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB7516 (Related) 2020-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public contracts and procurement
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
State and local government operations
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy assistance for the poor and aged
Energy efficiency and conservation
Low- and moderate-income housing
Public contracts and procurement
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2041/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2041/BILLS-116hr2041ih.pdf |