US HB2043 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides incentives for homeowners to invest in energy efficiency improvements. Specifically, the Department of Energy (DOE) must establish the Home Energy Savings Retrofit Rebate Program. Under the program, DOE must provide rebates to reward homeowners for achieving home energy savings. Rebates may not exceed $10,000 per individual, or 50% of the qualified home energy efficiency expenditures paid or incurred by the homeowner. DOE must develop a network of rebate aggregators or a national rebate aggregator that can facilitate the delivery of rebates to reimburse participating homeowners or contractors. In addition, DOE must develop guidelines for allowing utilities participating as rebate aggregators to count the energy savings from their participation toward state and local level energy saving targets. provides for the tax treatment of rebates, including an exclusion of such rebates from the taxable income of the homeowner. DOE must also make grants to states, Native American tribes, and Alaska Natives for carrying the programs established by this bill, including the development of quality assurance programs to oversee the delivery of home efficiency retrofit programs. Finally, DOE must establish a Residential Energy Efficiency Pay for Performance pilot program to encourage the use of measured energy savings, and financial payments for those energy savings, in the operation of residential energy efficiency programs.
Title
HOMES Act Home Owner Managing Energy Savings Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computers and information technology
Contracts and agency
Department of Energy
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Housing and community development funding
Licensing and registrations
Lighting, heating, cooling
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
State and local government operations
Women in business
Computers and information technology
Contracts and agency
Department of Energy
Employment and training programs
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Housing and community development funding
Licensing and registrations
Lighting, heating, cooling
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
State and local government operations
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2043/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2043/BILLS-116hr2043ih.pdf |