US HB2051 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 3) directs the Office of Science and Technology Policy to convene an interagency entity under the National Science and Technology Council with the responsibility of coordinating federal programs and activities in support of sustainable chemistry. Sustainable chemistry, also known as green chemistry, is focused on conserving resources and minimizing the generation and use of hazardous substances in chemical processes. (Sec. 4) The entity shall develop a working framework of attributes characterizing and metrics for assessing sustainable chemistry. The entity shall report to Congress and the Government Accountability Office on the present state and future of sustainable chemistry. (Sec. 5) The agencies participating in the entity shall carry out activities in support of sustainable chemistry, including activities that incorporate sustainable chemistry into existing research, development, demonstration, technology transfer, commercialization, education, and training programs. Any financial support provided shall (1) be available for pre-competitive activities only; and (2) not be used to promote the sale of a specific product, process, or technology, or to disparage a specific product, process, or technology. For FY2021-FY2030, no later than 90 days after submission of the President's annual budget request, the entity shall prepare and submit to Congress a report that includes a summarized agency budget in support of the activities carried out under this bill. (Sec. 6) The agencies participating in the entity may facilitate and support, through financial, technical, or other assistance, the creation of partnerships between institutions of higher education, nongovernmental organizations, consortia, or companies across the value chain in the chemical industry, including small- and medium-sized enterprises. To be eligible for support, a partnership in sustainable chemistry shall include at least one private sector organization. In selecting partnerships for support, the agencies participating in the entity shall also consider the extent to which the applicants are willing and able to demonstrate evidence of support for, and commitment to, the entity's goals. Financial support provided to partnerships may not be used to (1) support or expand a regulatory chemical management program at an implementing agency under a state law; (2) construct or renovate a building or structure; or (3) promote the sale of a specific product, process, or technology, or disparage a specific product, process, or technology.
Title
Sustainable Chemistry Research and Development Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] |
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-12-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9359-9361) |
2019-12-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2051. |
2019-12-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9359-9362) |
2019-12-09 | House | Ms. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-11-26 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 253. |
2019-11-26 | House | Committee on the Budget discharged. |
2019-11-26 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-312, Part I. |
2019-10-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB999 (Same As) 2020-08-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 513.
Subjects
Chemistry
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Manufacturing
Office of Science and Technology Policy
Product development and innovation
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Technology transfer and commercialization
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Manufacturing
Office of Science and Technology Policy
Product development and innovation
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Science and engineering education
Science, technology, communications
Technology transfer and commercialization