US HB2054 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a four-year safe harbor from antitrust laws for print or digital news companies to collectively negotiate with online content distributors (e.g., social media companies) regarding the terms on which the news companies' content may be distributed by online content distributors.
Title
Journalism Competition and Preservation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. James Comer [R-KY] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-04-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2981) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1700 (Related) 2019-06-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Competition and antitrust
Digital media
Internet and video services
News media and reporting
Science, technology, communications
Digital media
Internet and video services
News media and reporting
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2054/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2054/BILLS-116hr2054ih.pdf |