US HB2055 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Targeting Resources to Communities in Need

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Targeting Resources to Communities in Need

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
2019-04-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Energy and Commerce, Education and Labor, Science, Space, and Technology, Agriculture, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1066 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects

Alaska
Appalachian Regional Commission
Appropriations
Assault and harassment offenses
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Census and government statistics
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime victims
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Delta Regional Authority
Denali Commission
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Justice
Department of Labor
Department of Transportation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Economic development
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Employment and training programs
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Genetics
Government lending and loan guarantees
Housing discrimination
Human trafficking
Infrastructure development
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public transit
Regional and metropolitan planning
Roads and highways
Sex offenses
Social welfare
Transportation programs funding
Violent crime

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback