US HB2063 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constrains the President and executive agencies from constructing, operating, or offering wholesale or retail service on a broadband network unless given authority to do so by Congress. The Government Accountability Office must study and report on potential threats facing U.S. broadband networks from China, Iran, Russia, and other foreign adversaries and the risks of using foreign equipment and services in U.S. broadband networks.
Title
E-FRONTIER Act Eliminate From Regulators Opportunities to Nationalize The Internet in Every Respect Act
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB918 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 164.
Subjects
Asia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Iran
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Science, technology, communications
Subversive activities
Telephone and wireless communication
China
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Iran
Middle East
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Science, technology, communications
Subversive activities
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2063/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2063/BILLS-116hr2063ih.pdf |