US HB2064 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Improving Access to Capital for Emerging Growth Companies Act (Sec. 2) Amends the Securities Act of 1933 to reduce from 21 to 15 the number of days before a "road show" that an emerging growth company (EGC), before its initial public offering (IPO) date, may publicly file a draft registration statement for confidential nonpublic review by the SEC. (A financial "road show" is an offer [other than a statutory prospectus or a portion of one] that contains a presentation regarding an offering by one or more members of the issuer's management and includes discussion of one or more of the issuer, such management, and the securities being offered. Typically, a road show is a series of meetings across different cities, often before an IPO, in which top executives from a company have the opportunity to talk with current or potential investors.) (Sec. 3) Prescribes a grace period during which an issuer that was an EGC at the time it filed a confidential registration statement (or, in lieu of that, a publicly filed registration statement) for SEC review, but ceases to be an EGC, shall continue to be treated as an emerging market growth company for one year or, if earlier, until consummation of its IPO. (Sec. 4) Amends the Jumpstart Our Business Startups Act to direct the SEC to prescribe conditions under which a registration statement filed (or submitted for confidential review) by an issuer before its IPO may omit financial disclosure information for historical periods otherwise required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving Access to Capital for Emerging Growth Companies Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-15SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2015-07-14HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2015-07-14HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5147-5148)
2015-07-14HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2064.
2015-07-14HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5147-5149)
2015-07-14HouseMr. Hurt (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2015-07-14HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 152.
2015-07-14HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 114-203.
2015-05-20HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0.
2015-05-20HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2015-04-29HouseHearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral.
2015-04-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2015-04-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB37 (Related) 2015-01-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB1659 (Related) 2015-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB22 (Related) 2015-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 114-94. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback