US HB2069 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-21 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to determine at least annually whether certain covered drugs under Medicare were subject to a price increase that exceeded specified thresholds. Drug manufacturers must submit justifications for such price increases to the CMS, subject to civil penalties. The bill's requirements do not apply to low-cost drugs, as identified by the CMS.
Title
SPIKE Act Stopping the Pharmaceutical Industry from Keeping drugs Expensive Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2113 (Related) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 571.
Subjects
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Corporate finance and management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Manufacturing
Prescription drugs
Civil actions and liability
Corporate finance and management
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Manufacturing
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2069/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2069/BILLS-116hr2069ih.pdf |