US HB2083 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to ensure that procurement of certain items, such as body armor and other protective gear, meets specified requirements, including that a fraction of procurement funds be used for items manufactured in part or provided by U.S. small businesses. DHS shall (1) ensure that the items are purchased at a fair and reasonable price, and (2) study the adequacy of uniform allowances provided to employees.
Title
HOPR Act Homeland Procurement Reform Act
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-06-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-06-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4370-4371) |
2019-06-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2083. |
2019-06-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4370-4372) |
2019-06-10 | House | Mr. Correa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 65. |
2019-05-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-90. |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1055 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Buy American requirements
Congressional oversight
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Congressional oversight
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Small business