US HB2088 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2025 and revises the Energy Efficiency and Conservation Block Grant Program. Under the program, the Department of Energy provides grants to local governments, states, and Indian tribes for energy efficiency and conservation projects and programs. expands the allowable uses of grant funds to include the deployment of energy distribution technologies that significantly expand access to alternative fuels.
Title
To amend the Energy Independence and Security Act of 2007 to reauthorize the Energy Efficiency and Conservation Block Grant Program, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SB3711 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4447 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3711 (Related) 2020-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB4447 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government trust funds
Lighting, heating, cooling
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government trust funds
Lighting, heating, cooling
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2088/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2088/BILLS-116hr2088ih.pdf |