US HB2093 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-20)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates regulatory controls and administrative, civil, and criminal penalties under the Controlled Substances Act for certain marijuana-related activities that comply with state or tribal law. The bill also requires the Government Accountability Office to study and report on the effects of marijuana legalization on traffic safety.
Title
STATES Act Strengthening the Tenth Amendment Through Entrusting States Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1028 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3754 (Related) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB3754 (Related) 2019-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Alternative treatments
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government studies and investigations
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government studies and investigations
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2093/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2093/BILLS-116hr2093ih.pdf |