US HB21 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-05 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Midnight Rules Relief Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Congressional Review Act to allow Congress to consider a joint resolution to disapprove multiple regulations that federal agencies have submitted for congressional review within the last 60 legislative days of a session of Congress during the final year of a President's term. Congress may disapprove a group of such regulations together (i.e., "en bloc") instead of the current procedure of considering only one regulation at a time.
Title
Midnight Rules Relief Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] |
Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] |
Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-04 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 7 (Y: 183 N: 236 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-04 - House - On passage RC# 8 (Y: 238 N: 184 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-04 - House - On passage RC# 8 (Y: 238 N: 184 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-01-04 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-04 | House | On passage Passed by recorded vote: 238 - 184 (Roll no. 8). (text: CR H74) |
2017-01-04 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 183 - 236 (Roll no. 7). |
2017-01-04 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H86-87) |
2017-01-04 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Castor (FL) motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on adoption of the motion to recommit and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Castor (FL) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on adoption of the motion to recommit until a time to be announced. |
2017-01-04 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2017-01-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Castor (FL) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add at the end of the bill a section 3 pertaining to exception for certain rules that prohibit discrimination by insurance issuers on the basis of gender or preexisting condition or that make healthcare more affordable for working Americans. |
2017-01-04 | House | Ms. Castor (FL) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR H84) |
2017-01-04 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-01-04 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 21. |
2017-01-04 | House | The rule provides for one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. |
2017-01-04 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 5. (consideration: CR H74-86) |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR5 (Related) 2017-01-03 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB34 (Same As) 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 233.
SB34 (Same As) 2017-10-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 233.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidential administrations
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Congressional oversight
Government operations and politics
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidential administrations
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents