US HB2109 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

BRAVE Act Boosting Rates of American Veteran Employment Act This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), in awarding a contract for the procurement of goods or services, to give preference to offerors based on the percentage of the offeror's full-time employees who are veterans. The VA is also authorized to debar from VA contracting for at least five years any offeror determined to have willfully and intentionally misrepresented the veteran status of its employees. Such debarment shall include the debarment of all principals in the offeror for at least five years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BRAVE Act Boosting Rates of American Veteran Employment Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-06-24HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5045)
2019-06-24HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-24HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2109.
2019-06-24HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5045-5046)
2019-06-24HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-06-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 86.
2019-06-18HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-117.
2019-05-01HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
2019-04-04HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-04-04HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1621 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback