US HB2114 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transnational Drug Trafficking Act of 2013 - Amends the Controlled Substances Import and Export Act to prohibit the manufacture or distribution of a controlled substance in schedule I or II, flunitrazepam, or a listed chemical by individuals having reasonable cause to believe that such substance or chemical will be unlawfully imported into the United States or into waters within 12 miles of the U.S. coast. Prohibits the manufacture or distribution of a listed chemical: (1) intending or knowing that it will be used to manufacture a controlled substance; and (2) intending, knowing, or having reasonable cause to believe that the substance will be unlawfully imported into the United States. Amends the federal criminal code to revise the prohibition against, and penalties for, intentionally trafficking in a counterfeit drug to apply to intentionally trafficking in a drug and knowingly using a counterfeit mark on or in connection with such drug.
Title
Transnational Drug Trafficking Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2013-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB706 (Same As) 2014-12-16 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against property
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Intellectual property
Crimes against property
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Intellectual property
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2114/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2114/BILLS-113hr2114ih.pdf |