US HB2114 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Victims of Agent Orange Relief Act of 2015 Defines a "covered individual" as an individual who is a Vietnam resident and who: (1) is affected by health issues related to Agent Orange exposure which took place between January 1, 1961, and May 7, 1975; (2) lives or had lived in or near geographic areas in Vietnam that continue to contain high levels of Agent Orange; or (3) is affected by such health issues as the child or descendant of such an individual. Directs the Secretary of State to provide assistance: (1) to address the health care needs of covered individuals, (2) to institutions in Vietnam that provide health care to such individuals, (3) to repair and rebuild substandard homes in Vietnam for covered individuals and their families, and (4) to remediate geographic areas of Vietnam that contain high levels of Agent Orange. Directs the Secretary and the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to provide assistance to support research relating to health issues of individuals affected by Agent Orange. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to: (1) make grants to appropriate public health organizations and Vietnamese-American organizations to conduct a broad health assessment of Vietnamese-Americans who may have been exposed to Agent Orange and their children or descendants; and (2) establish centers in U.S. locations where large populations of Vietnamese-Americans reside to provide assessment, counseling, and treatment for conditions related to Agent Orange exposure. Amends veterans benefits provisions to provide benefits to the children of male (currently only female) Vietnam veterans who are affected by certain birth defects. Requires the VA Secretary to require any health care provider with whom the Secretary enters into a contract for the provision of health care to such children to provide the VA access to the medical records of such children for research into the intergenerational effects of Agent Orange exposure.
Title
Victims of Agent Orange Relief Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
Birth defects
Conflicts and wars
Environmental health
Foreign aid and international relief
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
International affairs
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Veterans' medical care
Vietnam
World health
Birth defects
Conflicts and wars
Environmental health
Foreign aid and international relief
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
International affairs
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Veterans' medical care
Vietnam
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2114/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2114/BILLS-114hr2114ih.pdf |