US HB2115 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to publish certain payment information regarding pharmacy benefit managers (PBMs) and prescription drugs. Specifically, the CMS must publish certain information, as reported by PBMs, relating to generic dispensing rates, drug discounts and rebates, and payments between PBMs, health plans, and pharmacies, in accordance with specified confidentiality requirements. The bill also provides statutory authority for certain provisions of the CMS rule titled "Modernizing Part D and Medicare Advantage to Lower Drug Prices and Reduce Out-of-Pocket Expenses," published on May 23, 2019. The rule requires, in part, Medicare prescription drug plan sponsors to implement an electronic, real-time benefit tool that is capable of integrating with at least one prescriber's electronic prescribing system or electronic health record. The tool must provide prescribers with patient-specific, real-time formulary and benefit information, including information regarding cost-sharing, formulary alternatives, and utilization management requirements. The rule takes effect January 1, 2021.
Title
Public Disclosure of Drug Discounts and Real-Time Beneficiary Drug Cost Act
Sponsors
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 586 (Y: 403 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-10-28 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 0 (Roll no. 586). (text: CR H8516) |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8520-8521) |
2019-10-28 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2115. |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8516-8519) |
2019-10-28 | House | Ms. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-05-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2113 (Related) 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 571.
HB2296 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 170.
HB3408 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3415 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2296 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 170.
HB3408 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3415 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Business records
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Prescription drugs
Retail and wholesale trades