US HB2119 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Hearing: Jul 17 @ 9:30 am in 2123 RHOB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to reauthorize grants for improving the energy efficiency of public buildings, and for other purposes. This bill reauthorizes for FY2021-FY2025 the program of Department of Energy grants to states to assist their units of local government in improving energy efficiency in public buildings and facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to reauthorize grants for improving the energy efficiency of public buildings, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-05-16HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-10HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback