US HB2134 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-5)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2023 the (1) Helen Keller National Center for Youths and Adults Who Are Deaf-Blind, and (2) Helen Keller National Center Federal Endowment Fund.
Title
Helen Keller National Center Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2019-09-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7732) |
2019-09-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2134. |
2019-09-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7732-7734) |
2019-09-17 | House | Ms. Jayapal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2019-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2601 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Disability and paralysis
Disability assistance
Employment and training programs
Government trust funds
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Labor and employment
Disability assistance
Employment and training programs
Government trust funds
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Labor and employment