US HB2145 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows various tax credits, tax deductions, and modifications to existing rules for individuals and businesses affected by certain federally declared disasters that began after January 1, 2018, and before the enactment of this bill. With respect to individuals and businesses in the affected areas, the bill waives the 10% additional tax on certain early distributions from retirement plans, permits individuals to recontribute funds to retirement plans if the funds were distributed for a home purchase that was cancelled on account of a disaster, increases the limit and extends the repayment deadline for loans from retirement plans, allows an employee retention tax credit for employers affected by disasters, temporarily suspends the limitation on tax deductions for charitable contributions for relief efforts in disaster areas, modifies the rules for the deduction for personal casualty losses, allows taxpayers residing in disaster areas to use earned income from the immediately preceding year for the purpose of determining earned income for the earned income tax credit and the child tax credit, and automatically extends tax filing deadlines for taxpayers who have a principal residence or place of business located in a disaster area. The bill also requires the Department of the Treasury to make payments to certain U.S. possessions to either compensate for revenue lost due to specified provisions in the bill or allow residents to benefit from the provisions.
Title
Disaster Tax Relief Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1133 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2284 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB536 (Related) 2019-01-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1095 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1148 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB617 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 28.
HB3301 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300.
HB3287 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2544 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
HB2284 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB536 (Related) 2019-01-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1095 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1148 (Related) 2019-02-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB617 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 28.
HB3301 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 300.
HB3287 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2544 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Guam
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax deferral
Income tax exclusion
Natural disasters
Northern Mariana Islands
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Wages and earnings
Disaster relief and insurance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Guam
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax deferral
Income tax exclusion
Natural disasters
Northern Mariana Islands
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
U.S. territories and protectorates
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2145/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2145/BILLS-116hr2145ih.pdf |