US HB2148 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 94-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BE HEARD in the Workplace Act Bringing an End to Harassment by Enhancing Accountability and Rejecting Discrimination in the Workplace Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BE HEARD in the Workplace Act Bringing an End to Harassment by Enhancing Accountability and Rejecting Discrimination in the Workplace Act

Sponsors

Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1491 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1082 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Age discrimination
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Assault and harassment offenses
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Congressional agencies
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Contracts and agency
Disability and health-based discrimination
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC)
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Genetics
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Indian social and development programs
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Lawyers and legal services
Library of Congress
Public contracts and procurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Self-employed
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Women's employment

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback