US HB2153 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-29)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to enter into acquisition, assistance, or financing agreements to address societal, cultural, health, and other barriers that adolescent girls face in accessing quality secondary education. The USAID shall seek to ensure that such activities meet various requirements related to monitoring and evaluating outcomes, collecting data, and adhering to gender-equality promotion policies. The Department of State shall periodically update and report to Congress a publicly available U.S. global strategy to empower adolescent girls. The U.S. Global Strategy to Empower Adolescent Girls, issued in March 2016, may serve as the initial version of the strategy. The USAID shall periodically report to Congress on the activities initiated under this bill and efforts to monitor and evaluate such activities.
Title
Keeping Girls in School Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-01-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-01-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H601-602) |
2020-01-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H601-605) |
2020-01-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2153. |
2020-01-28 | House | Mr. Phillips moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1071 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
HIV/AIDS
Human rights
International affairs
Marriage and family status
Nutrition and diet
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's education
Women's employment
Women's health
Women's rights
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
HIV/AIDS
Human rights
International affairs
Marriage and family status
Nutrition and diet
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's education
Women's employment
Women's health
Women's rights