US HB2156 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 647.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-14 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 647.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial Act (Sec. 3) This bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to establish the Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial at the dam site in Los Angeles County, California, to honor the victims of the Saint Francis Dam disaster of March 12, 1928. The Forest Service must manage the memorial. (Sec. 4) Within three years of this bill's enactment, USDA must submit to Congress recommendations regarding: the planning, design, construction, and long-term management of the memorial; the proposed boundaries; a visitor center and educational facilities; and ensuring public access to the memorial. (Sec. 5) The bill establishes the Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Monument on specified National Forest System land administered by USDA in Los Angeles County for the purpose of conserving and enhancing the cultural, archaeological, historical, watershed, educational, and recreational resources and values of the monument. (Sec. 6) Within four years of this bill's enactment, USDA must develop a management plan for the monument. USDA must manage the monument: (1) in a manner that conserves and enhances its cultural and historic resources, and (2) in accordance with the Forest and Rangeland Renewable Resources Planning Act of 1974. The bill limits the use of motorized vehicles but permits grazing within the monument.
Title
Saint Francis Dam Disaster National Memorial Act
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 647. |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-360. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-07-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5414-5415) |
2017-07-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2156. |
2017-07-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5414-5416) |
2017-07-11 | House | Mr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 147. |
2017-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-210. |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1926 (Same As) 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
California
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Historical and cultural resources
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Water resources development
Congressional oversight
Dams and canals
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Historical and cultural resources
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Water resources development