US HB2162 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the discount given by the Federal Housing Administration (FHA) on single-family mortgage-insurance premium payments for first-time homebuyers who complete a financial-management counseling program. Under current law, the maximum premium amount for such homebuyers is 2.75% of the original insured principal obligation of the mortgage (compared to 3% for other homebuyers). The bill instead requires that the premium amount for such homebuyers be 25 basis points (0.25% of the original insured principal obligation of mortgage) lower than the amount otherwise established by the FHA. The bill also specifies that first-time homebuyers must complete the financial-management counseling program prior to applying for a mortgage or entering into a sales agreement.
Title
Housing Financial Literacy Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-07-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5278) |
2019-07-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2162. |
2019-07-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5278-5280) |
2019-07-09 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 6. |
2019-06-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3639 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Financial literacy
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Life, casualty, property insurance
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Life, casualty, property insurance