US HB2165 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission, after consulting with public safety organizations and governmental entities, to issue final rules to prevent states from diverting 9–1–1 taxes, fees, or charges from purposes and functions related to 9–1–1 services and operational expenses.
Title
9–1–1 Fee Integrity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5928 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB451 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB451 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Science, technology, communications
State and local finance
User charges and fees
Emergency communications systems
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Science, technology, communications
State and local finance
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2165/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2165/BILLS-116hr2165ih.pdf |