US HB217 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 38-8)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enforce the licensure requirement for medical providers of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
Improving Confidence in Veterans’ Care Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-01-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1307 (Related) 2021-04-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2041 (Related) 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
SB2041 (Related) 2021-07-28 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/217/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr217/BILLS-117hr217ih.pdf |