US HB2181 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Chaco Cultural Heritage Area Protection Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chaco Cultural Heritage Area Protection Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 14.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-17HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2019-06-05HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-04-24HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-04-09HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1079 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback