US HB2184 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3349-3350)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3349-3350)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish measurable targets to evaluate the effectiveness of the VA's mental health and suicide prevention media outreach campaigns. The VA must also establish a process to oversee such outreach campaigns that includes a delineation of the roles of officials in leadership and contract oversight positions within the Office of Mental Health and Suicide Prevention of the Veterans Health Administration. Finally, the VA must ensure that each contract entered into for the development of such outreach campaigns includes a requirement that the contractor track and report on the established metrics.
Title
Reach Every Veteran in Crisis Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3349-3350) |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB606 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Internet and video services
Mental health
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Television and film
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Internet and video services
Mental health
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Television and film
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2184/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2184/BILLS-116hr2184ih.pdf |