US HB2185 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes the District of Columbia eligible to receive federal coastal zone management funding, including flood mitigation and prevention funds.
Title
District of Columbia Flood Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 261. |
2019-12-03 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-321. |
2019-09-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 15. |
2019-09-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-07-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-09 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E437) |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1734 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3258; text: CR S3258)
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
District of Columbia
Floods and storm protection
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Floods and storm protection
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources