US HB2199 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 313.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 313.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates specified land within the Bakersfield Field Office of the Bureau of Land Management and in the Los Padres National Forest in California as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System. The bill designates certain land in the Los Padres National Forest as the Machesna Mountain Potential Wilderness Area, to be incorporated into the Machesna Mountain Wilderness Area; the Fox Mountain Potential Wilderness Area, to be incorporated into the San Rafael Wilderness; the Condor Ridge Scenic Area; the Black Mountain Scenic Area; and the Condor National Scenic Trail. The bill also designates specified segments of the Indian, Mono, Matilija, Sespe, and Piru Creeks and Sisquoc River in California as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System and requires studies of new trails for recreation opportunities in California. Indian tribes shall be assured access to the wilderness areas, scenic areas, and potential wilderness areas designated by this bill for traditional cultural and religious purposes.
Title
Central Coast Heritage Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 313. |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-390. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 13. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1111 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2546 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3288 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2546 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3288 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
California
Electric power generation and transmission
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Lakes and rivers
Motor vehicles
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Religion
Right of privacy
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Electric power generation and transmission
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Lakes and rivers
Motor vehicles
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Religion
Right of privacy
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection