US HB2209 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the position of Chief Pharmaceutical Negotiator in the Office of the U.S. Trade Representative. The Chief Pharmaceutical Negotiator must conduct trade negotiations and enforce trade agreements related to pharmaceutical products and services.
Title
Fixing Global Freeloading Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3947 (Related) 2019-08-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3942 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3129 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3942 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Prescription drugs
Trade agreements and negotiations
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Prescription drugs
Trade agreements and negotiations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2209/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2209/BILLS-116hr2209ih.pdf |