US HB2211 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Guardians of America's Freedom Medal Act This bill requires each military department to carry out a program to award medals or other commendations to military working dogs and their handlers to recognize valor or meritorious achievement.
Title
Guardians of America's Freedom Medal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5515 (Related) 2018-08-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-232.
SB2954 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2987 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB2954 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB2987 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 439.
HR1019 (Similar To) 2018-07-24 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2211/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2211/BILLS-115hr2211ih.pdf |