US HB2224 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Labor to give homeless veterans with dependent children service priority under homeless veterans reintegration programs.
Title
Homeless Veterans with Children Reintegration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2020-03-12 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2224/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2224/BILLS-116hr2224ih.pdf |