US HB2232 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

New Pathways Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New Pathways Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-04-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-04-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1080 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback